GA SR176 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on March 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on March 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION commending Taiwan for its relations with the United States and the State of Georgia; and for other purposes.
Title
Taiwan; commend
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - Adoption: Senate Vote #125 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hopper |