GA SR153 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to authorize the General Assembly to provide by local law for the creation and comprehensive regulation of education improvement districts for the provision of facilities for one or more public or special schools; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
Education Improvement Districts; provide creation and comprehensive regulation -CA
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-01 - House - House Vote #403 - Table (Y: 108 N: 52 NV: 13 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #149 - Adoption Of Constitutional Amendment By Substitute (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #149 - Adoption Of Constitutional Amendment By Substitute (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | House Third Reading Lost | |
2010-04-27 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-20 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2010-04-14 | House Taken from Table | |
2009-04-01 | House Tabled | |
2009-04-01 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-26 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-12 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-10 | House First Readers | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-03 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-02-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-05 | Senate Read and Referred |