GA SR104 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL creating the Joint Crematoria Study Committee; and for other purposes.
Title
Joint Crematoria Study Committee; create
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Engrossed | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-09 | Senate Recommitted | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-07 | Senate Read and Referred |