GA SB65 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL To be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 44-13-100 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exemptions for the purposes of bankruptcy and intestate insolvent estates, so as to change provisions relating to an exemption; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Property; change provisions relating to an exemption
Sponsors
Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Sen. Hunter Hill [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] |
Sen. Harold Jones [D] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Rep. Mike Jacobs [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #439 (Y: 155 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #406 (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #40 (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #406 (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #40 (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-06 | Act 167 | |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2015-04-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-04-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-31 | House | House Postponed |
2015-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |