GA SB575 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Act 633
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Act 633
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Milledgeville Public Facilities Authority; to provide for a short title; to provide for definitions; to provide for purpose; to provide for severability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Milledgeville Public Facilities Authority; create
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - Supplemental Local Calendar : House Vote #746 (Y: 116 N: 42 NV: 6 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #646 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #646 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Act 633 | |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-14 | House | House First Readers |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hopper |