GA SB529 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-23 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 76 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to expedited franchising of cable and video services, so as to change the definition of video service relative to the "Consumer Choice for Television Act"; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cable and Video Services; definition of video service relative to the "Consumer Choice for Television Act"; change
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Ed Harbison [D] |
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #590 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Hopper |