GA SB504 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create a board of elections and registration for Warren County; to provide for its powers and duties; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Warren County; board of elections and registration; create
Sponsors
Sen. Max Burns [R] | Rep. Mack Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #665 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #541 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #541 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-27 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |