GA SB413 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-26 - Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-26 - Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 67A of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to conflicts of interest in zoning actions, so as to expand the definition of the term applicant; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Conflicts of Interest in Zoning Actions; definition of the term applicant; expand
Sponsors
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Greg Dolezal [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Rep. Andrew Welch [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #789 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #733 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #626 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #733 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #626 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended |
2020-06-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-06-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |