GA SB375 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 12 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to sale or distribution to, or possession by, minors of cigarettes and tobacco related products, so as to provide for additional penalties regarding any person under 21 years of age and vapor products; to revise the definition of vapor product; to provide for seizure by law enforcement of any cigarettes, tobacco products, tobacco related objects, alternative nicotine products, or vapor products sold to and in the possession of any person under 21 years of age; to provide for fine and penalties; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cigarettes and Tobacco Related Products; additional penalties regarding any person under 21 years of age; provide; definition of vapor product; revise
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #785 (Y: 45 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #761 (Y: 123 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #607 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #761 (Y: 123 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #607 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-22 | Act 483 | |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2020-06-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-06-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hopper |