GA SB232 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the State Court of Cobb County, approved March 26, 1964 (Ga. L. 1964, p. 3211), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 10, 2014 (Ga. L. 2014, p. 4102), so as to change the compensation of the judges of the state court; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Court of Cobb County; change the compensation of the judges of the state court
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] | Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] | Sen. Hunter Hill [R] | Sen. Horacena Tate [D] |
Sen. Michael Rhett [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #228 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-27 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |