GA SB231 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elementary and secondary education, so as to provide for a pilot program to allow for certain adults to enroll in charter schools that provide instruction only for individuals between ages 21 and 35 residing in this state who have not attained a high school diploma; to provide for an exception to the maximum age of eligibility for enrollment; to authorize local boards of education or the State Charter Schools Commission to approve charter schools that serve only individuals between ages 21 and 35 residing in this state who have not attained a high school diploma; to provide for funding for such charter schools; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to provide for a repealer; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; pilot program; individuals between ages 21 and 35 who have not attained a high school diploma; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Anavitarte [R] | Sen. Chuck Payne [R] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Sen. Sonya Halpern [D] | Sen. Lester Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #493 (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2022-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |