GA SB200 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 38 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to emergency powers of the governor, so as to provide that certain business and religious institutions may continue or resume operations if in compliance with applicable safety procedures during certain states of emergency; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Emergency Powers of the Governor; certain business and religious institutions may continue to resume operations; certain states of emergency; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #140 (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-31 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate Hopper |