GA SB184 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 1 of Chapter 18 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the state employees' health insurance plan, so as to provide that services covered under the state health benefit plan and furnished by a federally qualified health center are reimbursed at no less than the Medicare maximum allowable reimbursement rate; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Employees' Health Insurance Plan; services covered and furnished by a federally qualified health center are reimbursed at no less than the Medicare maximum; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - House Vote #292 (Y: 169 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #127 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #127 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-25 | Act 49 | |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |