GA SB177 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 28 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the General Assembly generally, so as to provide the requirements for consideration of local legislation revising existing districts or creating new districts by the General Assembly; to provide for preparation or review of local districting plans by the staff of the Legislative and Congressional Reapportionment Office; to provide for requirements and procedures; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
General Assembly; requirements for consideration of local legislation revising existing districts or creating new districts; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Sen. Steve Henson [D] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] |
Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Ricky Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - House - House Vote #253 (Y: 143 N: 20 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #165 (Y: 21 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #166 (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #165 (Y: 21 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #166 (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 263 | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-11 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |