GA SB149 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Title 11 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, related to sales under the commercial code, so as to enact the "Georgia Door-to-Door Sales Act"; to provide for a short title; to provide for definitions; to require sellers to furnish to buyers receipts and copies of any contracts; to require sellers to provide notice of how to cancel a sale; to restrict certain door-to-door sales; to regulate the use of certain forms and notices; to provide for certain exemptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Georgia Door-to-Door Sales Act"; enact
Sponsors
Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Jason Esteves [D] | Sen. Russ Goodman [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Sen. Josh McLaurin [D] | Sen. Lee Anderson [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] |
Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Sen. Max Burns [R] | Sen. Shawn Still [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] |
Rep. Robert Dickey [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #271 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Passage: House Vote #256 (Y: 160 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #94 (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Passage: House Vote #256 (Y: 160 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #94 (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Effective Date 2023-07-01 | |
2023-05-03 | Act 263 | |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2023-03-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-16 | House | House Postponed |
2023-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate Hopper |