GA SB129 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-11 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state government, so as to provide for the preservation of religious freedom; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for definitions; to provide for the granting of relief; to provide for a short title; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Georgia Religious Freedom Restoration Act"; provide for the preservation of religious freedom

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #79 (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #78 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #95 (Y: 37 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-11HouseHouse Second Readers
2015-03-09HouseHouse First Readers
2015-03-05SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2015-03-05SenateSenate Third Read
2015-03-05SenateSenate Engrossed
2015-03-04SenateSenate Read Second Time
2015-03-03SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2015-02-18SenateSenate Read and Referred
2015-02-17SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback