GA SB112 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 21 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to dispositions of fines and forfeitures, so as to revise provisions relating to additional criminal penalties for purposes of drug abuse treatment and education programs; to expand the list of offenses with respect to which such additional penalties shall be imposed; to provide that funds from such penalties may be used for drug court division purposes, as well as for the previously authorized purposes; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Courts; additional criminal penalties for purposes of drug abuse treatment/education programs; revise provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #135 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2010-04-01 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-12 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-10 | House First Readers | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-03 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-05 | Senate Read and Referred |