GA HB981 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-26 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-26 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to property tax exemptions, so as to allow certain for profit corporations to participate in the indirect ownership of a home for the mentally disabled for primarily financing purposes; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for a referendum; to provide for a contingent effective date; to provide for automatic repeal under certain circumstances; to provide for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Taxation; certain for profit corporations to participate in the indirect ownership of a home for the mentally disabled for primarily financing purpose; allow
Sponsors
Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] | Rep. Patricia Gardner [D] | Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] |
Rep. Mable Thomas [D] | Rep. Sheila Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - House - House Vote #615 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-11 | House | House Hopper |