GA HB980 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to primaries and elections generally, so as to provide for the reopening of qualifications in municipal elections under certain conditions; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Municipal elections; reopening of qualifications under certain conditions; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Ed Rynders [R] | Rep. Heath Clark [R] | Rep. Buzz Brockway [R] |
Rep. Jason Spencer [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Vote #599 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Vote #599 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-10 | House | House Hopper |