GA HB966 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state flag, seal, and other symbols, so as to provide for placement within the capitol building or grounds of a braille American flag as a monument honoring blind veterans in Georgia and the United States; to provide for a short title; to provide for design, procurement, and placement of the monument; to provide that placement of the monument shall comply with the federal Americans with Disabilities Act; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Braille American Flag Monument Honoring Blind Veterans Act of Georgia; enact
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-23 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-22 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/66122 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/221301 |