GA HB933 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act entitled "Macon Water Commissioners - Pension Plan," approved December 30, 1953 (Ga. L. 1953, p. 2831), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 1, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 5637), so as to modify provisions related to termination of employment before retirement; to modify provisions related to direct rollovers; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Macon Water Commissioners - Pension Plan"; termination of employment before retirement; modify provisions
Sponsors
Rep. James Epps [R] | Rep. Allen Peake [R] | Rep. Nikki Randall [D] | Rep. James Beverly [D] |
Rep. Robert Dickey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-08 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/48182 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/156757 |