GA HB913 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 31-2-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Board of Community Health and its powers, functions, and duties, terms of office, vacancies, and removal of members, the chairperson of the board, and expenses, so as to prohibit persons having certain conflicts of interest from serving on the board; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Community Health, Board of; persons having certain conflicts of interest from serving on board; prohibit
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Micah Gravley [R] |
Rep. Michael Caldwell [R] | Rep. John Pezold [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #672 (Y: 120 N: 52 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-04 | House | House Hopper |