GA HB88 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 6 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding superior court judges, so as to revise the qualifications for superior court judges; to provide for the vacation of such office under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Superior courts; qualifications for judges; revise
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Regina Quick [R] | Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] |
Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #312 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #344 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #227 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Vote #24 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #344 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #227 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Vote #24 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-01 | Act 48 | |
2017-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-28 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-01-31 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-01-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-01-24 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-23 | House | House Hopper |