GA HB879 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 3 of Title 3 of the O.C.G.A., relating to provisions regarding the regulation of alcoholic beverages generally, so as to provide for the legislative intent of the General Assembly to exercise strict regulatory control over the three-tier system; to provide for penalties; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages; legislative intent of the General Assembly to exercise strict regulatory control over the three-tier system; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #749 (Y: 114 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #717 (Y: 23 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #704 (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #718 (Y: 42 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Vote #560 (Y: 110 N: 54 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-03 Effective Date
2020-08-03 Act 558
2020-08-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2020-07-02HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-06-25HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2020-06-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-06-23SenateSenate Third Read
2020-06-23SenateSenate Taken from Table
2020-06-23SenateSenate Third Read Tabled
2020-06-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-06-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-06-20SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-06-19SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-03-12SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-03-10HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-10HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-03-05HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-02-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-02-04HouseHouse First Readers
2020-02-03HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20192020/HB/879
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/189262.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/192285.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/192905.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/194217.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/194443.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/195224.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17578
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17876
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17862
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17875
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17962

Bill Comments

feedback