GA HB873 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create a joint county-municipal board of elections and registration for Butts County, approved May 11, 2009 (Ga. L. 2009, p. 3908), so as to prohibit persons employed by certain local governments from being eligible to serve on the board for a designated period of time following their government employment; to clarify the procedures for a member of the board to resign; to change the title of the election supervisor to election director; to provide that employees of the board are county employees with the same obligations and benefits as other county employees; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Butts County; joint county-municipal board of elections; prohibit persons employed by certain local governments from being eligible to serve on the board for a designated period of time following their government employment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #790 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Vote #460 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Vote #460 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 524 | |
2020-07-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-04 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-03 | House | House Hopper |