GA HB868 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to imposition, computation, and exemptions from state income tax, so as to provide for the comprehensive revision of income tax credits for business enterprises located in less developed areas, designated by tiers, for business enterprises located in less developed areas consisting of contiguous census tracts, for existing manufacturing and telecommunications facilities located in certain tier counties, and for establishing new quality jobs or relocating quality jobs; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax credits; business enterprises located in less developed areas designated by tiers; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Atwood [R] | Rep. Amy Carter [R] | Sen. Ronnie Chance [R] | Rep. Josh Clark [R] |
Rep. Doug Collins [R] | Rep. Earl Ehrhart [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - House - House Vote #708 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #643 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 43 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #642 - Adoption Of Amendment #5 By Senator From The 42nd To Committee Sub (Y: 20 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #641 - Adoption Of Amendment #4 By Senator From The 42nd To Committee Sub (Y: 21 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #639 - Passage (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #643 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 43 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #642 - Adoption Of Amendment #5 By Senator From The 42nd To Committee Sub (Y: 20 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #641 - Adoption Of Amendment #4 By Senator From The 42nd To Committee Sub (Y: 21 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #639 - Passage (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-03 | Act 767 | |
2012-05-03 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-20 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Transmits House | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-07 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-29 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-03 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-02 | House First Readers |