GA HB854 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 32-4-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to naming state roads, bridges, or interchanges, so as to provide that the name of any street or road under the jurisdiction of a political subdivision that, on January 1, 1968, was named for a veteran and whose name has been changed since such date shall on January 1, 2017, revert back to the name which such street or road was named on January 1, 1968, and shall not be subject to any further change; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State roads, bridges, or interchanges; road named for a veteran and whose name has been changed shall revert back to the name which such street or road was named on January 1, 1968; provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-27 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/47851 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/155756 |