GA HB823 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to abolish the office of elected county surveyor of Henry County; to provide for the appointment of a county surveyor; to provide for contingent effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Henry County; appointment of county surveyor; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Baker [D] | Rep. Steve Davis [R] | Rep. Rahn Mayo [D] | Rep. Howard Mosby [D] |
Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. John Yates [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #817 - Supplemental Local Consent Calendar (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 17 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House Vote #452 - Local Calendar (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House Vote #452 - Local Calendar (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-11 | Act 499 | |
2012-04-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-09 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-03 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-02 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-02 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-02 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-31 | House Second Readers | |
2012-01-30 | House First Readers |