GA HB818 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 9 of Title 34 of the O.C.G.A., relating to workers' compensation, so as to change certain provisions relating to workers' compensation insurance, awards, benefits, and administration; to provide that administrative law judges are subject to the Georgia Code of Judicial Conduct; to change provisions related to an employer's duties to provide the State Board of Workers' Compensation with certain information; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Workers' compensation; insurance, awards, benefits and administration; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. James Shaw [R] | Rep. Chad Nimmer [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] |
Rep. R Bryant [D] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #726 (Y: 10 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #727 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Vote #547 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #727 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Vote #547 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 402 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-17 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-17 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-25 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-22 | House | House Hopper |