GA HB792 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act making and providing appropriations for the State Fiscal Year beginning July 1, 2019, and ending June 30, 2020, known as the "General Appropriations Act," Act No. 319, approved May 10, 2019, so as to make, provide, and change certain appropriations for the operation of the State government and its departments, boards, bureaus, commissions, institutions, and other agencies, for the university system, common schools, counties, municipalities, and political subdivisions, for all other governmental activities, projects, and undertakings authorized by law, and for all leases, contracts, agreements, and grants authorized by law; to provide for the control and administration of funds; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Supplemental appropriations; State Fiscal Year July 1, 2019 - June 30, 2020
Sponsors
Rep. David Ralston [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] |
Sen. Jack Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #592 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #593 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #568 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #569 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #529 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Vote #463 (Y: 126 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #593 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #568 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #569 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #529 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Vote #463 (Y: 126 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Effective Date | |
2020-03-17 | Act 326 | |
2020-03-17 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-03-12 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-03-12 | House | House Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 4th, 49th, 30th |
2020-03-05 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 116th, 47th, 159th |
2020-03-05 | House | House Insisted |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Insisted |
2020-03-05 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-02-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-16 | House | House Hopper |