GA HB780 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to retirement and pensions, so as to provide for membership of full-time judges of the state-wide business court in the retirement plan established for appellate court judges; to provide for transfers of membership to such plan from the Judicial Retirement System; to sunset the participation of such judges in the Judicial Retirement System; to provide for related matters; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Retirement and pensions; membership of full-time judges of the state-wide business court in the retirement plan established for appellate court judges; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - Passage: House Vote #490 (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-02 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-22 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-18 | House | House Hopper |