GA HB780 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 7 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to financial institutions, so as to provide for numerous changes to provisions applicable to the Department of Banking and Finance and financial institutions generally, banks and trust companies, credit unions, licensed sellers of payment instruments, those licensed to cash payment instruments, and mortgage lenders and mortgage brokers; to provide for power of the commissioner to issue orders relative to state chartered financial institutions to exercise rights and powers authorized by federal law but not authorized under state law; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Banking and finance; changes to provisions applicable to financial institutions; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #817 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #650 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Vote #522 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #650 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Vote #522 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 339 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-30 | House | House Hopper |