GA HB719 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 1 of Chapter 3 of Title 8 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to powers of housing generally, so as to require housing authorities to develop and implement policies granting housing preferences to veterans who are homeless individuals; to provide for exemptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Buildings and housing; housing authorities to develop and implement policies granting housing preferences to veterans who are homeless; require
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Derrick Jackson [D] | Rep. Mike Glanton [D] |
Rep. Brian Prince [D] | Rep. Sheila Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-23 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-22 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52125 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/171349 |