GA HB715 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of the City of Norcross to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Norcross, City of; levy an excise tax; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Hugh Floyd [D] | Rep. Pedro Marin [D] | Rep. Tom Rice [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #396 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-03-20 - House - House Vote #306 - Local Calendar (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 29 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2009-03-20 - House - House Vote #306 - Local Calendar (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 29 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-11 | Act 334 | |
2009-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-15 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-23 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-20 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-20 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-20 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-12 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-10 | House First Readers |