GA HB655 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]


A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 15 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to miscellaneous provisions under the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to require every public school to post a sign containing the toll-free telephone number operated by the Division of Family and Children Services of the Department of Human Services to receive reports of child abuse or neglect; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide that no cause of action is created; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Quality Basic Education Act; post sign containing telephone number to receive reports of child abuse; require every public school


Roll Calls

2018-02-08 - House - House Vote #477 (Y: 145 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]


2018-03-15SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-12SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-08HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-02-08HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-06HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-19HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-18HouseHouse Hopper
2017-11-30HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources

Bill Comments