GA HB648 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of White; to provide for boundaries and powers of the city; to provide for a governing authority of such city and the powers, duties, authority, election, terms, vacancies, compensation, expenses, qualifications, prohibitions, conflicts of interest, and suspension and removal from office relative to members of such governing authority; to provide for inquiries and investigations; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

White, City of; provide new charter

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #374 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #294 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-04-02SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-29SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-26HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-26HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-22HouseHouse First Readers
2019-03-21HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback