GA HB626 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create and establish the Greene County Airport Authority, approved March 13, 1978 (Ga. L. 1978, p. 3223), so as to split the position of secretary-treasurer into two separate positions; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Greene County Airport Authority; split position of secretary-treasurer into two separate positions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #324 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - House Vote #332 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - House Vote #332 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 161 | |
2013-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-22 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-20 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-20 | House | House Hopper |