GA HB606 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-3-519 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions regarding HOPE scholarships and grants, so as to add the Georgia Independent School Association to the list of accrediting agencies; to provide for an effective date; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
HOPE scholarships; add Georgia Independent School Association to the list of accrediting agencies
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Nix [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Rep. Bill Yearta [R] | Rep. Dave Belton [R] |
Rep. Mike Cheokas [R] | Rep. Philip Singleton [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #381 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Passage: House Vote #168 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Passage: House Vote #168 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 201 | |
2021-05-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-23 | House | House Hopper |