GA HB593 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create and incorporate the City of Denton in the County of Jeff Davis and grant a charter to that municipality under that name and style, approved February 28, 1966 (Ga. L. 1966, p. 2352), so as to revise the manner of filling vacancies; to provide for submission under Section 5 of the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Denton, City of; filling vacancies; revise manner
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Sims [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #294 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-03-05 - House - House Vote #131 - Local Calendar (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2009-03-05 - House - House Vote #131 - Local Calendar (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-11 | Act 280 | |
2009-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-14 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-05 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-05 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-05 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-04 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-03 | House First Readers |