GA HB584 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act changing the compensation of the clerk of the superior court, the sheriff, and the judge of the Probate Court of Cobb County from the fee system to the salary system, approved February 9, 1949 (Ga. L. 1949, p. 427), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 2, 2017 (Ga. L. 2017, p. 3673), so as to restyle the executive assistant and the executive secretary of the clerk of the superior court as administrative managers; to change the salary of the administrative managers of the clerk of the superior court; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cobb County; Superior Court; restyle the executive assistant and the executive secretary of the clerk as administrative managers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Vote #228 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-13HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-13HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-13HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-11HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-08HouseHouse First Readers
2019-03-07HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback