GA HB58 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-1-8 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to safe operation of motor carriers and commercial motor vehicles, so as to update the reference date to federal regulations regarding the safe operation of motor carriers and commercial motor vehicles; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; reference date to federal regulations regarding the safe operation of commercial motor vehicles and carriers; update
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Rogers [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] |
Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. Betty Price [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #183 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Vote #22 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Vote #22 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-01 | Act 44 | |
2017-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-01-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-01-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-01-23 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-12 | House | House Hopper |