GA HB563 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Clarkston Development Authority; to provide a short title; to provide definitions; to provide for the powers of the authority; to provide for members of the authority; to provide a development area; to provide for revenue bonds and other obligations of the authority; to recite constitutional authority; to provide for effect on other authorities; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Clarkston Development Authority Act; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #213 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Vote #265 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Vote #265 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-03 | Act 134 | |
2017-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-10 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-09 | House | House Hopper |