GA HB539 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-23 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-23 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act relating to the school system of the City of Savannah and Chatham County, approved March 21, 1968 (Ga. L. 1968, p. 2636), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 28, 2010 (Ga. L. 2010, p. 3637), so as to revise provisions relating to the term of office of the president of the board of education; to provide for submission of this Act for approval under the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Savannah, City of; term of office of board of education president; revise provisions
Sponsors
Rep. R Bryant [D] | Rep. Craig Gordon [D] | Rep. Ann Purcell [R] | Rep. Edward Stephens [D] |
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-22 - House - House Vote #220 - Local Calendar (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-22 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-22 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-21 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-16 | House First Readers |