GA HB523 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-06 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Banking and Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-06 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Banking and Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 7 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to industrial loans, so as to prohibit the issuance of a license to issue industrial loans within a certain distance from a military base or installation; to require certain disclosures related to insurance premiums on industrial loans in certain instances; to prohibit persons engaged in the business of making industrial loans from issuing payment instruments which create a loan contract upon redemption, unless a previous contract has been entered into between the two parties; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Banking and finance; industrial loans; certain distance from military base or installation; prohibit issuance of license to issue
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Rep. Brian Prince [D] | Rep. Chad Nimmer [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] |
Rep. John Meadows [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #247 (Y: 146 N: 6 NV: 13 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-28 | House | House Hopper |