GA HB479 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide for the Board of Education of Forsyth County and to consolidate and restate provisions of law relating to the board, approved March 24, 1992 (Ga. L. 1992, p. 5052), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 18, 2007 (Ga. L. 2007, p. 3783), so as to change the compensation of the chairperson and members of the board; to remove compensation for per diem expenses; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Forsyth County; Board of Education; change compensation of chairperson and members
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Dudgeon [R] | Rep. Mark Hamilton [R] | Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] | Rep. Geoff Duncan [R] |
Rep. Calvin Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #180 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House Vote #114 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House Vote #114 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2013-04-30 | Act 100 | |
2013-04-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-25 | House | House Hopper |