GA HB468 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-2-85.1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to special license plates for veterans, so as to add veterans who served in Operation Iraqi Freedom, Operation Enduring Freedom, and the Global War on Terrorism; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Special license plates; Operations Iraqi and Enduring Freedom, Global War on Terrorism; add veterans
Sponsors
Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Rep. Doug Collins [R] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] |
Rep. John Yates [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-07 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-04 | House First Readers |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/33466 |
Text | http://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2011_12/versions/hb468_LC_34_2991_a_2.htm |