GA HB44 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to state government, so as to provide that this state shall observe daylight savings time year round; to provide for contingent effectiveness; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State government; Georgia shall observe daylight savings time year round; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Rep. Timothy Barr [R] | Rep. William Werkheiser [R] |
Rep. Matthew Gambill [R] | Sen. Ricky Williams [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Motion To Table: Senate Vote #269 (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #268 (Y: 21 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-03-05 - House - Passage: House Vote #182 (Y: 112 N: 48 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #268 (Y: 21 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-03-05 - House - Passage: House Vote #182 (Y: 112 N: 48 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Lost |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-03 | House | House Postponed |
2021-01-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-01-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-12 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-11 | House | House Hopper |
2020-12-15 | House | House Prefiled |