GA HB4 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 11 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to public school property and facilities, so as to prohibit a local school system from leasing or selling a public school in such system to a private entity unless such public school has been in existence for at least 15 years; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; prohibit local school system from leasing or selling a public school to a private entity unless school has been in existence for at least 15 years
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-14 | House | House Hopper |
2020-11-16 | House | House Prefiled |