GA HB369 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 3 of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to sales tax for educational purposes, so as to change certain provisions regarding distribution of the sales tax for educational purposes; to provide for related matters; to provide for contingent effectiveness; to provide for automatic repeal under certain conditions; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; distribution for educational purposes; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Nix [R] | Rep. Earl Ehrhart [R] | Rep. Carlton Rogers [R] | Rep. Paul Battles [R] |
Rep. Tom Dickson [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #212 (Y: 160 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-18 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-17 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/43828 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/148229 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/43828#12505 |