GA HB334 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 6 of Title 15 and Article 1 of Chapter 17 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to clerks of superior courts and general provisions regarding notaries public; to amend Part 1 of Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 44 and Article 4 of Chapter 18 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to recording of deeds and other real property transactions and inspection of public records; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Superior courts; clerks; notaries public; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Senate - Motion To Table: Senate Vote #434 (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Sub As Am: House Vote #414 (Y: 162 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #383 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Passage: House Vote #139 (Y: 167 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31SenateSenate Tabled
2021-03-31HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2021-03-31SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-31SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-31SenateSenate Taken from Table
2021-03-29SenateSenate Tabled
2021-03-25SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-03-05SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-10HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-09HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-08HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback